+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services