+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to Finance
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
+ − Votes (6)
April 23, 2014: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 12-1.
April 17, 2014: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
March 7, 2014: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-117 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor