+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor