+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Reengrossed w/ Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (14)
April 22, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 13-0.
April 16, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. The motion passed on a vote of 10-0.
April 16, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.026 (Attachment G). The motion passed without objection.
April 16, 2015: House Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.027 (Attachment H). The motion passed without objection.
February 13, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 15-115 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 7-0.
February 3, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment Q). The motion passed without objection.
February 3, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment R). The motion passed without objection.
February 3, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.006 (Attachment M). The motion failed on a vote of 2-3.
February 3, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment K). This motion was withdrawn.
February 3, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment P). The motion failed on a vote of 2-3.
February 3, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt Amendment L.002 (Attachment T). The motion passed without objection.
February 3, 2015: Senate Finance: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012 (Attachment S). The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor