+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance