+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor