+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
May 1, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Refer 11 to the Committee of the Whole. The motion passed on a vote of 12-1.
April 10, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed on a vote of 4-3.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor