+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations