+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services