+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On May 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs