+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor Action - Signed
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education + Appropriations
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education + Appropriations