+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services