+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Finance
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology