+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 13, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 06/01/2020 - No Amendments
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Local Government Lay Over Amended
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government