+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor Signed
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary