+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Transportation Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 18, 2016: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .SB16-100
March 17, 2016: Senate Transportation: . .SB16-100
March 17, 2016: Senate Transportation: . .SB16-100
March 17, 2016: Senate Transportation: . .SB16-100
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor