+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 01/27/2017 - No Amendments
- Introduced In House - Assigned to