+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/18/2014 - No Amendments
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
- Introduced In House - Assigned to