+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2015 - No Amendments
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2015 - No Amendments
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/01/2015 - No Amendments
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor