+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily02/13/2015
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/06/2015 - No Amendments
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor