+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/06/2015 - No Amendments
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor