+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 21, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor