+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1465
May 9, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1465
May 5, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1465
May 5, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .HB16-1465
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor