+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1453
May 3, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1453
May 3, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1453
April 26, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1453
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor