+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2016: Senate Appropriations: . .HB16-1444
May 9, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1444
May 5, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1444
April 25, 2016: House State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: . .HB16-1444
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor