+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 3, 2024 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 29, 2024 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 26, 2024 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 15, 2024 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor