+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1441
May 3, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1441
April 27, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .HB16-1441
April 27, 2016: House Transportation & Energy: . .HB16-1441
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor