+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2016: Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: . .HB16-1436
April 19, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .HB16-1436
April 19, 2016: House Business Affairs and Labor: . .HB16-1436
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor