+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations