+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary