+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- House Committee on Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business, Labor, Economic, & Workforce Development
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor