+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations