+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee Vote - Final Action Failed
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 4, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services