+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor