+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 28, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .HB16-1387
April 12, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1387
April 12, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1387
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor