+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 04/25/2018 - No Amendments
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor