+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 06/21/2015 - No Amendments
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Finance
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs