+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Lost - No Amendments
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services