+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Postpone Indefinitely
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor