+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 5, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1380
May 5, 2016: Senate Finance: . .HB16-1380
May 3, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1380
May 3, 2016: House Appropriations: . .HB16-1380
April 8, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1380
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor