+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor