+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Finance
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
May 5, 2015: Senate Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.003 The motion passed without objection.
May 1, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection.
May 1, 2015: House Appropriations: FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.017 The motion passed without objection.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor