+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/012016 - No Amendments
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .HB16-1377
April 20, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .HB16-1377
April 20, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .HB16-1377
April 20, 2016: Senate Health & Human Services: . .HB16-1377
March 22, 2016: House Public Health Care & Human Services: . .HB16-1377
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor