+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On June 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Finance
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government