+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary