+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/09/2017 - No Amendments
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
- Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor