+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Education Postpone Indefinitely
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Education