+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
- House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor