+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/26/2018 - No Amendments
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- House Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government