+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed
On May 31, 2022 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On May 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
On April 22, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
On April 20, 2022 in the House:
- House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor